This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 00:45:43 (UTC).

HOUSING AUTHORITY VS FORREST

Case Summary

On 12/03/2015 HOUSING AUTHORITY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FORREST. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1471

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTY OF CONTRA

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

MARLON FORREST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, SHARON L.

County Counsel 651 Pine Street 9Th Floor

Martinez, CA 94553-1229

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED UN SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketFILE ENDORSED COPIES AND WRIT FORWARDED TO COUNTY COUNSEL IN INTER-OFFICE ENVELOPE PROVIDED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED - BEFORE TRIAL ON 01/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NOOR AL S. FORSLAND FILED RE: SUPPORT OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2015 OF HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTYOF CONTRA AGAINST DEFENDANT MARLON FORREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2015 OF HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTYOF CONTRA FILED AS TO DEFENDANT MARLON FORREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • DocketFAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketSUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2015 OF HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTYOF CONTRA AS TO DEFENDANT MARLON FORREST WITH MAILING DATE OF 12/08/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 12/08/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 1/19/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2015 OF HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE COUNTYOF CONTRA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON, SHARON L.