This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/27/2016 at 10:50:19 (UTC).

HOOVER VS. MAZHARI

Case Summary

On 03/01/2010 HOOVER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAZHARI. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0162

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHNATHAN J HOOVER

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

JENNIFER HOOVER

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Defendant

NICHOLAS MAZHARI

Lafayette, CA 94549

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2010
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY JOHNATHAN J HOOVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • SERVICE ON 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF JOHNATHAN HOOVER NICHOLAS MAZHARI IS QUESTIONABLE FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: SIGNATURE IS ILLEGIBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON 1ST AMENDED CLAIM OF PLTF OF JOHNATHAN HOOVER AS TO DEFENDANT NICHOLAS MAZHARI WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 05/05/10

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2010
  • JENNIFER HOOVER ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS REFERAL TO MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2010
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 03/01/2010 OF JOHNATHAN HOOVER AS TO NICHOLAS MAZHARI FILED. DATE OF MAILING 03/19/10. FEE FOR SERVICE $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 4/19/10 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BEIGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $4,215.00

    Read MoreRead Less