This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 20:42:09 (UTC).

HOMEPORT INSURANCE VS MOCKEL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 HOMEPORT INSURANCE filed an Other lawsuit against MOCKEL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas, Danielle K. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0449

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Douglas, Danielle K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HOMESPORT INSURANCE

1260 B Street Suite 220

Haward, CA 94541

Defendant and Respondent

MOCKEL, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DOOLITTLE, WALLACE C

1260 B Street Suite 220

Haward, CA 94541

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PHILLIPS, DENNIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance

08/17/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

08/17/2022: Notice of Continuance

Req Filed and Dismissal without Prejudice of Entire Action

08/04/2022: Req Filed and Dismissal without Prejudice of Entire Action

Minutes

07/11/2022: Minutes

Minutes

07/11/2022: Minutes

Reply to:Motion to strike

07/01/2022: Reply to:Motion to strike

Reply to: ISO Demurrer to def Answer to complaint

07/01/2022: Reply to: ISO Demurrer to def Answer to complaint

Declaration Filed Re:

06/23/2022: Declaration Filed Re:

Opposition Filed Re: Motion to Strike Defs Answer

06/23/2022: Opposition Filed Re: Motion to Strike Defs Answer

Opposition Filed Re:

06/23/2022: Opposition Filed Re:

CORR 1

06/16/2022: CORR 1

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

06/08/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

Declaration Re:

06/08/2022: Declaration Re:

Motion to Strike

06/08/2022: Motion to Strike

Miscellaneous Filing Re:

06/08/2022: Miscellaneous Filing Re:

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

06/08/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

Demurrer Filed

06/08/2022: Demurrer Filed

Proof of Service by Mail

05/24/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Case Management Conference; Notice of Continuance; Notice of Continuance; Judicial Officer: Douglas, Danielle K; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated-Case Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReq Filed and Dismissal without Prejudice of Entire Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Hearing on Motion in Re:; Minutes; Judicial Officer: Douglas, Danielle K; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer to:; Minutes; Judicial Officer: Douglas, Danielle K; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to:; Reply to:Motion to strike; Comment: Brief ISO Motion to Strike Portions of Defendants Answer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to:; Reply to: ISO Demurrer to def Answer to complaint; Comment: ISO Demurrer to Defendats Answer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Declaration Filed Re:; Comment: Declaration Of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition Filed Re:; Opposition Filed Re: Motion to Strike Defs Answer; Comment: Motion to Strike Defs Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition Filed Re:; Comment: Demurrer to Defendant's Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer/Response/Denial - Unlimited

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Served: 03/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Substituted Service of:; Proof of Subtituted Service of:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Cause Of ActionComplaint; Type: Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Complaint; File Date: 03/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Summons Issued/Filed; Comment: ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON Complaint/Petition FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Comment: CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docket*; Comment: Clerk`s Tickler to Check for Proof of Service was set for 5/13/22 at 7:00 in dept. 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docket*; Comment: Case Management Conference was set for 8/02/22 at 8:30 in Dept. 18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint Filed - Summons Issued; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED 220309-0007-CK ULC/ 435.00 Paymt Operator Code: KVAQU *FEE: 220309-0007-CK ULC/ 435.00 Paymt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less