This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:50:01 (UTC).

HOLLY A. HOUNSLOW-RAVIN VS BRADLEY S. RAVIN

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 HOLLY A HOUNSLOW-RAVIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRADLEY S RAVIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2455

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOLLY A HOUNSLOW-RAVIN

Danville, CA 94526

Respondent

BRADLEY S RAVIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR DISSOLUTION FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • (2336) FINAL JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/30/2018 OF HOLLY HOUNSLOW-RAVIN AGAINST BRADLEY S RAVIN BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELLIMINARY W 4C DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY HOLLY A HOUNSLOW-RAVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO BRADLEY S RAVIN FILED. DATE COPY MAILED BY CLERK TO RESPONDENT 050919.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/30/2018 OF HOLLY HOUNSLOW-RAVIN AS TO BRADLEY S RAVIN (SERVED ON 11/15/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/30/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/26/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 5/30/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLDEN ROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/30/2018 OF HOLLY HOUNSLOW-RAVIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/28/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/26/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.