Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 06:04:48 (UTC).

HOLBROOK VS NAHLIK

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 HOLBROOK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NAHLIK. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0268

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

EDWARD HOLBROOK

Danville, CA 94526

Defendant and Appellant

IVAN NAHLIK

Danville, CA 94526

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL FROM SUPERIOR COURT ENTERED ON 03/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TO DENIAL OF MOTION TO VACATE SET BY COURT; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF HEARING NOTICE ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING WAS SET FOR 3/16/16 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FROM THE JUDGMENT FILED BY CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 04/10/2012 OF EDWARD HOLBROOK IVAN NAHLIK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • THE COURT NOW RULES ON THE MOTION TO VACATE HEARD ON 12/07/15. THE MOTION IS DENIED. YOU HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE MAILING OF THIS NOTICE TO FILE AN APPEAL OF THE DENIAL OF THE MOTION TO VACATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS MOTION TO VACATE FILED BY IVAN NAHLIK; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 07/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 06/07/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 6/07/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $3,520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less