This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/05/2017 at 19:53:51 (UTC).

HISSEN VS LOVE

Case Summary

On 12/21/2016 HISSEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOVE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********4490

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMSEY HISSEN

Defendant

CHIQUILA LOVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVENS, STACEY M

158 W. Linda Mesa Ave

Danville, CA 94526

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE DEFENDANT/PROSECUTE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF RAMSEY HISSEN AS TO CHIQUILA LOVE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE DEFENDANT/PROSECUTE CASE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DECLARATION OF STACEY STEVENS FILED RE: IN OPPOSITION TO IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/21/2016 OF RAMSEY HISSEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/09/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/24/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.