Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 18:03:39 (UTC).

HICKEY VS GREYSTONE HOMES, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2012 HICKEY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against GREYSTONE HOMES, INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2582

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORNELIUS MICHAEL HICKEY

ADRIAN COWLING

LUCRECIO NUNEZ CARRILLO

ROBERT & CAR OLYN DELBO

DAREN & SHAN NON MUSKET

CHRISTOPHER & CINDY ANDERSON

MARK DEMINICO

ERIN ROBERTS

ROBERT ROTHSCHILD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GREYSTONE HOMES, INC.

LENNAR SALES CORP

Cross Defendants

TAO MECHANICAL, LIMITED

J. REDFERN, INC.

PETERSON PAINTING,INC.

ALL AMERICAN FENCECORPORATION

THE INVIRONMENTALISTS COMMERCIAL SERVICES

MOES 1-100

ZOES 1-50

CAMERON CONCRETE, INC.

WATKINS MIDCAL DRYWALL, INC.

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MASTERSON, MARK J

2800 Donald Douglas Loop North

Santa Monica, CA 90405

MAGRATH, ALEXA

10250 Constellation Blvd Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING, RYAN M

1333 N. California Blvd. Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Cross Defendant Attorneys

ARABI, ARASH S

21215 Burbank Blvd Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

NUNEZ, ELIZABETH A

1655 Grant Street, Ste.800-B Law Offices Of Timothy Wagner

Concord, CA 94520

HEPPS, STEVEN M

One Mac Arthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Other Attorneys

SANDERS, BRIAN M

2300 Clayton Road Suite 350

Concord, CA 94520

KIRVIN, TOM

71 Stevenson Street Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

BRAASCH, DEBRA L

575 Anton Boulevard Suite 1000

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MOAK, STACY

4700 Lang Ave

Mcclellan, CA 95652

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SHUEY, DAVID T

1970 Broadway, Ste 1150

Oakland, CA 94612

COTE, SCOTT D.

1435 River Park Drive Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

HURN, SANDRA B

333 University Ave. Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CRS-CMPLNT BY T&C ROOFING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CRS-COMPLAINT BY SHEEHAN CONSTRUCTION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FAILURE TO MAKE PAYMENT ON SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CORNELIUS MICHAEL HICKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ROBERT ROTHSCHILD, LINDA SAVAGE, CORNEL & SIN ZIANA TODOR, MATTHEW & JE NNIFER WARE, MARK & LAURI WHEATLEY, HELEN WHEELER, RICHARD & LI SA WOEST, JOE LEDESMA ADDS ATTORNEY ALEXA MAGRATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF RICHARD & BE TH HOLZHAUER, KIRSTEN JENSEN, JAMES & JOAN N KLEMENT, ERIC & NANCY LEFEBVRE, DANNY & MIKE LYN MARTIN, DAREN & SHAN NON MUSKET, THOMAS & WIL MA PETERS, ERIN ROBERTS ADDS ATTORNEY ALEXA MAGRATH

    Read MoreRead Less
390 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2012
  • DAREN & SHAN NON MUSKET, LINDA NAKAJI, THOMAS & WIL MA PETERS, ERIN ROBERTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • DANNY & MIKE LYN MARTIN ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • ERIC & NANCY LEFEBVRE, TIMOTHY & BR ENDA LOMAX ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • RICHARD & BE TH HOLZHAUER, KIRSTEN JENSEN, JAMES & JOAN N KLEMENT ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • ANTONIO & KR ISTIN GARCIA, SOMA GOTTIPATI, RICHARD & PE GGY HALL ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • MARK & NATAL TY DICORTASSO ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • LUCRECIO NUNEZ CARRILLO, RICHARD & YO LANDA CASTELLANOS, ADRIAN COWLING, ROBERT & CAR OLYN DELBO ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • RICHARD & CA ROL BELCHAR, RONALD & JAN ET BERTOLONE, ZOE & ERICA BLOCH, GEORGE & JAC QUELINE BROWN ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • CHRISTOPHER & CINDY ANDERSON ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • VINCENT J VILDRIALES, OLGA B CAMARILLO, NELLIE S LOPEZ, CHRIS & MELI SSA ALLISON ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL AMERICAN FENCECORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Peterson Painting, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where J. REDFERN, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DUPONT FLOORING SYSTEMS, INC. is a litigant