This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 15:27:21 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VS. STRAW HAT RESTAURANTS

Case Summary

On 03/28/2014 HERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STRAW HAT RESTAURANTS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0376

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIA HERNANDEZ

SEBASTIAN HERNANDEZ

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SPM PROPERTIES INC

STRAW HAT RESTAURANTS, INC

LONE TREE CENTER LLC

WINCO FOODS,LLC

LISTEK ENTERPRISES, INC

WINCO FOOD INC

LONE TREE CENTER, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LONE TREE CENTER LLC

LISTEK ENTERPRISES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERALTA II, DAVID O

414 13Th St 7Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCLELLAN, ESQ., BRIAN R.

505 14Th Street Suite 1210

Oakland, CA 94612

YOSHIMURA, FRANCES H

401 Lennon Lane Suite 125

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

ARAKAWA, GREGORY P

1401 Willow Pass Road Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520-7982

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2016
  • RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 12 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR`S CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT SIGNED AND SENT TO ROOM 103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE SIGNED AND SENT TO ROOM 103

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2013
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 02/20/2013 OF MARIA HERNANDEZ RE: BUSINESS STRAW HAT RESTAURANTS, INC W/MAILING ON 03/01/13 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 5/22/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/20/2013 OF MARIA HERNANDEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDEN ROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/30/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/26/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.