This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:26:16 (UTC).

HERCULES VS. POBLETE

Case Summary

On 08/18/2017 HERCULES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against POBLETE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0551

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERCULES URBAN PARTNERS, LLC

Defendant

TYRONE POBLETE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

100 Saratoga Avenue Suite 200

Santa Clara, CA 95051

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2018
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED WHOLLYUN SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF HERCULES URBAN PARTNERS, LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT TYRONE POBLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DECLARATION OF TODD B. ROTHBARD FILED RE: DAILY RENTAL VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF HERCULES URBAN PARTNERS, LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT TYRONE POBLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF HERCULES URBAN PARTNERS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF HERCULES URBAN PARTNERS, LLC AS TO DEF ENDANT TYRONE POBLETE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 08/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 10/03/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2017 OF HERCULES URBAN PARTNERS, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less