This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 12:04:41 (UTC).

HELOISE MAGNO VS JOSE S. BORLAZA

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 HELOISE MAGNO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOSE S BORLAZA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3223

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HELOISE MAGNO

Respondent

JOSE S. BORLAZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WADE, AMIEL L

262 East Main Street

Los Gatos, CA 95030

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2025
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 09/25/2020 OF HELOISE MAGNO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/24/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/24/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/27/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/24/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 9/24/25 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 16

    Read MoreRead Less