This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:42:35 (UTC).

HAYNES V. MARIA

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 HAYNES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARIA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0917

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RALPH HAYNES

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

MARLA F. MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONSALVES, MARTIN T.

511 West 3Rd Street

Antioch, CA 94509

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO STEVE DERBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF RALPH HAYNES AS TO DEFENDANT MARLA F. MARIA WITH MAILING DATE OF 08/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 08/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF RALPH HAYNES AGAINST DEFENDANT MARLA F. MARIA, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 09/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF RALPH HAYNES FILED AS TO DEFENDANT MARLA F. MARIA, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 10/02/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/17/2017 OF RALPH HAYNES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.