This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 11:31:07 (UTC).

HARTSTEIN VS ALROB BUILDING SERVICES ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 HARTSTEIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALROB BUILDING SERVICES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2472

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CYNTHIA HARTSTEIN

ROBERT HARTSTEIN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALROB BUILDING SERVICES

FJELLBO & SON CONSTRUCTION, INC.

PLUMBING CAR, INC.

S & K OF THE EAST BAY, INC.

PLUMBING CARE, INC.

PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION & REMODELLING OF THE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FJELLBO & SON CONSTRUCTION, INC.

S & K OF THE EAST BAY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORMAN, J. KENNETH

1200 Pacific Ave Ste.260

Santa Cruz, CA 95060

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LOMPA, JULIET M.

2125 Ygnacio Valley Rd., Ste. 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

WELCH, STEPHEN B.

2185 North California Blvd Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

REYNOLDS, MICHAEL R

2030 Franklin Street Sixth Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

SAGEHORN, DEREK

5860 Owens Drive Suite 410

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingDept: 07; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketTHIS CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH MASTER CASE C20-00124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketACTIONS CONSOLIDATED WITH MASTER CASE CIV/MSC20-00124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - CONSOLIDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSITIONED BY CONSOLIDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketALL FURTHER DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED IN MASTER CASE # C20-00124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketFILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2020 OF ROBERT HARTSTEIN RE: BUSINESS ALROB BUILDING SERVICES W/MAILING ON 12/23/20 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket5CMC5 CALENDARED ON 04/21/21 IN DEPT. 12. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 04/21/21 IN DEPT. 07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket5OPSC5 CALENDARED ON 02/08/21 IN DEPT. 12. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 02/08/21 IN DEPT. 07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/08/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2020 OF ROBERT HARTSTEIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/21/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION & REMODELING OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS, MICHAEL R.