This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/02/2022 at 12:22:57 (UTC).

HARRIS VS BROWN

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 HARRIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0295

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM HARRIS

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant

ASHANTA ROYAL BROWN

Oakland, CA 94612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORNSTEIN, JONATHAN HERSCHEL

2701 Telegraph Avenue Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

MORRISON, HOWARD

1300 Clay St, Ste 600

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingDept: 21; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ASHANTA ROYAL BROWN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket(U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/14/2022 OF WILLIAM HARRIS FILED BY ASHANTA ROYAL BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ASHANTA ROYAL BROWN (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 4/18/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 02/14/2022 OF WILLIAM HARRIS AS TO DEFT(S) ASHANTA ROYAL BROWN, SIGNED ON 02/22/22 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/14/2022 OF WILLIAM HARRIS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES RECVD FROM PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: INFOTRACK, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: WILLIAM HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/11/22 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/20/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morrison, Howard Esq.