Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 16:52:22 (UTC).

HARPER VS GILPIN

Case Summary

On 03/15/2010 HARPER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GILPIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0220

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHEN S. HARPER

Orinda, CA 94563

Defendant

SCOTT GILPIN

Orinda, CA 94563

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/05/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/05/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 07/21/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 03/15/2010 OF STEPHEN HARPER AS TO DEFENDANT SCOTT GILPIN FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 06/06/10. FEE FOR SERVICE $157.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2010
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED ON THE CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 03/15/2010 OF STEPHEN HARPER AS TO DEFENDANT SCOTT GILPIN. REASON NOT SERVED: UNCLAIMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • LODGED LTR FROM PLTF W/REQ TO POSTPONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 5/12/10 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 03/15/2010 OF STEPHEN HARPER SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: SCOTT GILPIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $1,618.75

    Read MoreRead Less