This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 07:04:15 (UTC).

HANSON VS. BAY AREA NEWS GROUP

Case Summary

On 08/30/2016 HANSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAY AREA NEWS GROUP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0373

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

ARTHUR HANSON

Oakley, CA 94561

Defendant and Appellant

BAY AREA NEWS GROUP

1700 Cavallo Road

Antioch, CA 94809

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • FEE COLLECTED FOR REQUEST OF AUDIO CASSETTE TAPE OF RECORDED PROCEEDINGS ( 25.00 POSTAGE INCLUDED) FROM 08/03/16 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL FROM SUPERIOR COURT ENTERED ON 12/09/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/03/16 SET ASIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY APPELLANT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF ADDRESSED TO JUDGE PRO TEM STEVEN DERBY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • AUTH FOR DUFFY CAROLAN TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF BAY AREA NEWS GROUP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/03/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 08/03/16 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • LETTER FROM BAY AREA NEWS GROUP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 8/03/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/03/2016 OF ARTHUR HANSON SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: BAY AREA NEWS GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less