This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 10:46:13 (UTC).

HANNIBAL'S VS RICHMOND HOUSING

Case Summary

On 05/27/2014 HANNIBAL'S filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RICHMOND HOUSING. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2382

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNIBAL'S, INC. ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION

Defendants

RICHMOND HOUSING ASSOCIATES, LP

R. E. WEST BUILDERS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOSS, JEFFREY A.

35 Mitchell Blvd Ste 6

San Rafael, CA 94903-2012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 05/27/2014 OF HANNIBAL'S, INC. ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION RE: BUSINESS R. E. WEST BUILDERS, INC W/MAILING ON 06/28/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 05/27/2014 OF HANNIBAL'S, INC. ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION RE: BUSINESS RICHMOND HOUSING ASSOCIATES, LP W/MAILING ON 07/05/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/27/2014 OF HANNIBAL'S, INC. ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/27/2014 OF HANNIBAL'S, INC. ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR SUMMONS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/14/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 7/31/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANNIBAL INC. DBA HANNIBAL PICTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSS JEFFREY A.