This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:39:15 (UTC).

HANCOCK VS. DELTA VIEW GOLF CLUB

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 HANCOCK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DELTA VIEW GOLF CLUB. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0223

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEAN HANCOCK

Defendants

DELTA VIEW GOLF CLUB, LLC

CITY OF PITTSBURG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAPPAS, ESQ., PETER C.

3105 Lone Tree Way Suite A

Antioch, CA 94509

Defendant Attorney

MCGREEVY, RICHARD E

2833 Laguna Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 4/02/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DEAN HANCOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DEAN HANCOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DELTA VIEW GOLF CLUB, LLC, CITY OF PITTSBURG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: PAPPAS & PAPPAS-RAJOTTE LLP, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: DEAN HANCOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 5/05/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF DEAN HANCOCK AS TO CITY OF PITTSBURG WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF DEAN HANCOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/06/2017 OF DEAN HANCOCK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/12/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/26/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.