This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:20:03 (UTC).

HAMMETT VS LAWRENCE/ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 HAMMETT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LAWRENCE/ROBINSON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0200

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KELLY HAMMETT

JOHN DAVID HAMMETT

Defendants

LINDA LAWRENCE

CONSUELO LAWRENCE

DOMINQUE LAWRENCE

ESSIE ROBINSON

ARIANA WATSON LAWRENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

100 Saratoga Avenue Suite 200

Santa Clara, CA 95051

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/08/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DECLARATION OF TODD ROTHBARD FILED RE: USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 03/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/23/2016 OF JOHN HAMMETT AS TO DEFENDANT ARIANA WATSON LAWRENCE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/23/2016 OF JOHN HAMMETT AS TO DEFENDANT DOMINQUE LAWRENCE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/23/2016 OF JOHN HAMMETT AS TO DEFENDANT CONSUELO LAWRENCE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/23/2016 OF JOHN HAMMETT AS TO DEFENDANT ESSIE ROBINSON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/23/2016 OF JOHN HAMMETT AS TO DEFENDANT LINDA LAWRENCE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/23/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 4/08/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/23/2016 OF JOHN HAMMETT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.