Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 13:23:50 (UTC).

HALL VS STEIN

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 HALL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1985

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LORRAINE HALL

DANNY HALL

Defendants

EUGENE STEIN

ANGELA STEIN

ROBERT STEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REDMOND, GREGORY S

2450 Stanwell Drive

Concord, CA 94520

Defendant Attorneys

JOOST, WILLIAM E.

7 Mt Lassen Drive C-110

San Rafael, CA 94903

WALSH, CATHERINE A

1800 Sutter Street, Ste. 260

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • WILLIAM E. JOOST CHANGES ATTORNEY FOR ANGELA STEIN AND IS REPLACED BY CATHERINE A WALSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ROBERT STEIN, EUGENE STEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ANGELA STEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. EDGAR W HAWKYARD SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR ROBERT STEIN, EUGENE STEIN, ANGELA STEIN AND IS REPLACED BY WILLIAM E. JOOST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/12/2016 OF DANNY HALL FILED BY ROBERT STEIN, EUGENE STEIN, ANGELA STEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ONE HOUR DELIVERY SERVICE, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: ROBERT STEIN, EUGENE STEIN, ANGELA STEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY S REDMOND, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: DANNY HALL, LORRAINE HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE ON HEARING ON OSC TO: GREGORY S REDMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/12/2016 OF DANNY HALL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/28/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/16/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOOST WILLIAM E. JR.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH, CATHERINE A.