Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 10:49:08 (UTC).

GUTIERREZ VS ONE WEST BANK

Case Summary

On 09/18/2012 GUTIERREZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ONE WEST BANK. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2115

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCO GUTIERREZ

Discovery Bay, CA 94514

Defendants

ALEGRO APRAISAL SERVICES

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC SERVICES, INC. AND MERS

WILLIAM D.L. WILKERSON

DEBBIE WARREN

FIRST AMERICAN LONESTART TRUSTEE SERVICES

LENDER PROCESSING SERVICES, INC.

FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY

LISA HART

MTC FINANCIAL, INC.

LEHMAN BROTHS HLDING, IN

INDYMAC MORTGAGE SERVICES A DIVISION OF ONE

LSI TITLE COMPANY

STRUCTURED ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION

INDEPENDENT REAL ESTAE BROKERS

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGITRATION SYSTEMS INC

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

INDYMAC FEDE RAL BANK, F. S.B.

ONE WEST BANK, FSB

AUROAR LOAN SERVICES, LLC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEL CASTILLO, JASON A

515 South Figueroa Street Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3309

Other Attorneys

SQUILLARIO, STEPHEN J

71 Stevenson Street 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2981

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARCO GUTIERREZ FILED BY NATIONS LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARCO GUTIERREZ FILED BY ONE WEST BANK, FSB, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGITRATIONSYSTEMS INC, MERSCORP, IN; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT OF MARCO GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ONE WEST BANK, FSB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF MARCO GUTIERREZ FILED BY ONE WEST BANK, FSB, US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGITRATIONSYSTEMS INC, MERSCORP, IN; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NATIONS LLCS NTC OF DEMURRER, MPA, REQJN ON (SEE SERVICE LIST) FILED; SERVED ON 04/04/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF DFDT NATIONS OPPOSITION TO PLTFF M. GUTIERREZS REQUEST FOR JUDICAL NOTICE FILED BY ATTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • REQUEST OF NATIONS LLC FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2012
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO MARCO GUTIERREZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MARCO GUTIERREZ (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/29/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/02/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE COMPANY, INDEPENDENT REAL ESTAE BROKERS, DEBBIE WARREN, WILLIAM D.L. WILKERSON, LATANYA D. WILKERSON, ALEGRO APRAISAL SERVICES ADDED AS A DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/18/2012 OF MARCO GUTIERREZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDEN ROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRUCTURES ASSET SECURITIES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LSI TITLE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where LENDER PROCESSING SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where INDYMAC FEDERAL BANK is a litigant