Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 22:47:47 (UTC).

GRISMORE VS. HOMEQ

Case Summary

On 04/19/2012 GRISMORE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOMEQ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0945

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESIA YVETTE GRISMORE

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION

NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC.

ASSET BACKED SECURITIES CORPORATION

EXECUTIVE TRUSTEE SERVICES

HOMEQ SERVICING CORPORATION

U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC.

BARCLAYS CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INC.

CREDIT SUISSE INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRIOULLE, STEVAN J.

1330 Broadway Suite 1602

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorneys

YU, FELICIA Y

355 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1514

JOHNSON, NICOLE M

3780 Kilroy Airport Way Suite 130

Long Beach, CA 90806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2012
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND MAILING ADDRESS FILED BY DESIA YVETTE GRISMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DESIA GRISMORE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • TO 103 - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BARCLAYS CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INC., U.S. BANK NATIONALASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/16/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/04/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF/TO PENDING ACTION FILED BY DESIA YVETTE GRISMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/19/2012 OF DESIA GRISMORE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARCLAYS CAPITAL REAL ESTATE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Credit Suisse International is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMEQ SERVICING is a litigant

Latest cases where EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW is a litigant