This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 17:15:07 (UTC).

GREEN, SR. VS WIEL BRIEN

Case Summary

On 04/11/2014 GREEN, SR filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against WIEL BRIEN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0743

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODNEY M. GREEN SR

JUDITH CAESAR

ANAPETA TANGITAU

SYLVONIA LITTLEPAGE

DEWAYNE LITTLEPAGE

KEVIN TABOR

AILEEN TABOR

JERAMIAH VERA

OTO TANGITAU

MOEAKI TANGITAU

ANGELA CRUSE

KAREN SIMMONS

Defendants

WIEL BRIEN, LLC

DC REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC

DC REAL ESTATE FUND II, LP

WIEL BRIEN FUND III, LP

WIEL BRIEN FUND IV, LP

J WAYPOINT HOMES, INC.

WAYPOINT REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC

JOSHUA TREE HOMES,LLC

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROONEY, KEVIN F.

121 Spear Street Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorney

CIRANGLE, ELLEN

600 Montgomery St., 14Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2014
  • FIRM/ATTORNEY KEVIN F. ROONEY UPDATED USING FIRM CODE KFR TO CORRECT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY RODNEY M. GREEN SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR COMPLAINT FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT & APPROVING MOTION FOR AWARD OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RODNEY M. GREEN SR, JUDITH CAESAR, ANAPETA TANGITAU, SYLVONIA LITTLEPAGE, DEWAYNE LITTLEPAGE, KEVIN TABOR, AILEEN TABOR, JERAMIAH VERA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR JNT MTN FOR PREL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY RODNEY M. GREEN SR, JUDITH CAESAR, ANAPETA TANGITAU, SYLVONIA LITTLEPAGE, DEWAYNE LITTLEPAGE, AILEEN TABOR, JERAMIAH VERA; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • DECLARATION OF KEVIN DAGEFORDE FILED RE: NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • AMENDED NTC OF MOTION & JNT MOTION FOR FINAL APPRO VAL OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MTN FOR PREL APPROVAL OF PREL INJ, DECL, MPA ON 10 10-14 SEE SVC LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DECLARATION OF ANDREW A AUGUST FILED RE: ISO JNT MTN FOR FNL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND PLT FS MTN FOR ATTY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2014
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2014 OF RODNEY GREEN PAID BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • J WAYPOINT HOMES, INC., WAYPOINT REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC, JOSHUA TREE HOMES,LLC, BONGA HOLDINGS LLC, PRIVATE PINNACLE LLC, BLUE OASIS LLC, ESPAVE HOLDINGS LLC, MAC PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • OTO TANGITAU, MOEAKI TANGITAU, ANGELA CRUSE, KAREN SIMMONS, DC REAL ESTATE GROUP, LLC, DC REAL ESTATE FUNDII, LP, WIEL BRIEN FUND III, LP, WIEL BRIEN FUND IV,LP ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2014 OF RODNEY GREEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/21/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 5/27/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.