This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 22:25:43 (UTC).

GREATER EAST BAY PROPERTIES VS AEGIS BIOMEDICAL

Case Summary

On 12/28/2012 GREATER EAST BAY PROPERTIES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AEGIS BIOMEDICAL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0895

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREATER EAST BAY PROPERTIES LLC

1280 Blvd Way

Walnut Creek, CA 94595

Defendants

AEGIS BIOMEDICAL, INC., A NEVADA CO

1280 Blvd Way

Walnut Creek, CA 94595

DENNIS HO

Walnut Creek, CA 94595

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2013
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD ON AEGIS BIOMEDIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 04/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 04/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 04/30/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF NANCY THOMAS AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 12/28/2012 OF GREATER EAST BAY PROPERTIES LLC AS TO AEGIS BIOMEDICAL, INC., A NEVADA CO, DENNIS HO FILED. DATE OF MAILING 03/07/13. FEE FOR SERVICE $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 4/25/13 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. SCT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $7,696.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less