This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 01:12:42 (UTC).

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE VS. HURTADO

Case Summary

On 07/02/2014 GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HURTADO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0828

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

HURTADO'S AUTO SALES, INC.

ISMAEL HURTADO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

HURTADO'S AUTO SALES, INC.

ISMAEL HURTADO

ESTHER M HURTADO

MECHANICS BANK

THOMAS BOND

ANNGELA IZAGUIRRE

JASON TEBBETT

TIFFANY TOTORICA

ELIAS MEDINA

AFC CAL, LLC

VICTOR M GONZALEZ

EUGENIA AMADOR

JIMMY L BABB

NEXTGEAR CAPITAL, INC.

THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

FIRST US COMMUNITYCREDIT UNION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

AFC CAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

FALLAT, JOHN L

68 Mitchell Blvd Ste 135

San Rafael, CA 94903-2046

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FERNS, BARRY W.

2815 Mitchell Drive Suite 210

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

QUALL, MATTHEW W

205 E. River Park Circle Suite 110

Fresno, CA 93720

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 1 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR ABSTRACT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 01/19/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • JUDG W/FILE SENT TO CLKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2014 OF GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ELIAS MEDINA, THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2014 OF GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST US COMMUNITYCREDIT UNION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR JUDGMENT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR MISCELLANEOUS TRUST PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • INTERPLEADER FUNDS TRUST MONIES POSTED BY GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2014 OF GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/27/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/09/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.