Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 07:15:40 (UTC).

GRAY VS. CALIFORNIA DELTA FARMS

Case Summary

On 12/11/2012 GRAY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DELTA FARMS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2870

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LORIN T ENGLER

DEBORA M ENGLER

ROCKY GRAY

SHIRLEY ESTHER KORPI

JUDITH M FRANZI-PRICE

JAMES E HOPWOOD

MARILYN A HOPWOOD

PHILLIP CURTIS KING

REINER W LENIGK

MARY L LENIGK

GEORGE D LEYDECKER

FRANK CHEN FAN LIN

GLORIA J SCIABICA

PHILIP CURTIS KING

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DELTA FARMS, INC.

HOLLAND LAND AND WATER COMPANY

CALIFORNIA RECLAIMED LANDS COMPANY

RECLAMATION DISTRICT 799

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISCHER, DAVID R

1017 Green Lane Po Box 1997

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2015
  • DEFAULT HEARING ON CALIFORNIA DELTA FARMS, INC., HOLLAND LAND AND WATER COMPANY, CALIFORNIA RECLAIMED LANDS COMPANY, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWNCLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR E; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR QUIETING TITLE FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 11/18/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • BRIEF RE: DEFAULT HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DEFAULT HEARING ON CALIFORNIA DELTA FARMS, INC., HOLLAND LAND AND WATER COMPANY, CALIFORNIA RECLAIMED LANDS COMPANY, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWNCLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR E; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DEFAULT HEARING ON CALIFORNIA DELTA FARMS, INC., HOLLAND LAND AND WATER COMPANY, CALIFORNIA RECLAIMED LANDS COMPANY, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWNCLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR E; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DEFAULT HEARING ON CALIFORNIA DELTA FARMS, INC., HOLLAND LAND AND WATER COMPANY, CALIFORNIA RECLAIMED LANDS COMPANY; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2012
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT WITH CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 1/28/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/11/2012 OF LORIN ENGLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/19/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/25/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reclamation District No 3 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David R. Fischer