This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:33:19 (UTC).

GOLDEN GATE WAY VS. MONROE

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 GOLDEN GATE WAY filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against MONROE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0775

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GOLDEN GATE WAY, LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SCOTT MONROE

ESTATE OF RONALD MONROE, DECEASED

JOY MONROE

ESTATE OF MATTHEW MONROE, DECEASED

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

SCOTT VINCENT MONROE

JEANNE KAY STEWART

SHARYN ANNE CLIFTON

FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

SHAUNA MONROE

GOLDEN GATE WAY, LLC

WILLIAM PEACKOCK

MARGARET PEACOCK

SHARYN CLIFTON

YOLANDA PEACOCK

BARRY GROSS

JAMES PEACOCK

GOLDEN GATE WAY, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

DEAL, J GARRET

2255 Morello Ave, Ste 160

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

WESTBROOK, JOEL M

2255 Morello Ave Ste 240

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FELDMAN, AARON R

1855 Olympic Blvd., Ste 125

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GRITZER, ANNE C

601 Montgomery St 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

CLOSSON, ROBERT V

5030 Camino De La Siesta Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92108

HANDLOFF, HARMON J

500 Washington Street Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

CIPITI, NICHOLAS A

601 Montgomery Street Ninth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

WOO, NOAH M

601 Montgomery Stree, Ninth Fl Oor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CLOSSON, ROBERT V

5030 Camino De La Siesta Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92108

WOO, NOAH M

601 Montgomery Stree, Ninth Fl Oor

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

DEAL, J GARRET

2255 Morello Ave, Ste 160

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR DISMISS THE COMPLAINT AS TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DE FILED BY FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR CONSOLIDATE W/ C19-00745 FILED BY JEANNE KAY STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR DISMISS THE COMPLAINT AS TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DE FILED BY FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR CONT OF HEARING ON 8/14/19 BY FIREMAN FUNDS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR DISMISS THE COMPLAINT AS TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DE FILED BY FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR CONTINUANCE OF HRG TO 8-14-19 FROM JOY MONROE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR DIRECT COMPLIANCE W/DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FILED BY GOLDEN GATE WAY, LLC; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DECLARATION OF HARMON HANDLOFF FILED RE: ISO DEF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION WAS SET FOR 8/28/19 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2016 OF GOLDEN GATE WAY, LLC, ESTATE OF RONALD MONROE, DECEASED IS REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2016 OF GOLDEN GATE WAY, LLC, ESTATE OF MATTHEW MONROE, DECEASED IS REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT ANSWERED AS INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2016 OF GOLDEN GATE WAY, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/12/16 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/29/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTBROOK, JOEL M.