This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 11:43:21 (UTC).

GLISSON/NEADLE V. GORDON

Case Summary

On 03/22/2016 GLISSON/NEADLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GORDON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0184

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JIM GLISSON

Brentwood, CA 94513

TAMMY NEADLE

Brentwood, CA 94513

Defendant

ANN GORDON

Brentwood, CA 94513

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 05/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO CASA BLANCA APARTM ENTS C/O DEBRA TREVINO ON 03/28/16 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 03/22/2016 OF JIM GLISSON AS TO DEFENDANT ANN GORDON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 5/04/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JIM GLISSON (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO JIM GLISSON IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO TAMMY NEADLE IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY TAMMY NEADLE (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $4,794.32

    Read MoreRead Less