This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 11/07/2022 at 01:23:14 (UTC).

GILES VS CANUS CORP/PG&E CORP

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 GILES filed an Other lawsuit against CANUS CORP/PG E CORP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weil, Edward G. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0496

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weil, Edward G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GILES, MARTINEZ ANDRE

Defendants and Respondents

CANUS CORPORATION , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PG&E CORPORATION , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DE BLOUW, NATHAN J.

2255 Calle Clara

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons

04/12/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons

05/02/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Complaint Filed

05/13/2022: Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Electronic Service

05/13/2022: Proof of Electronic Service

Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited

05/20/2022: Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited

Miscellaneous Filing Re:

05/20/2022: Miscellaneous Filing Re:

Miscellaneous Filing Re:

05/20/2022: Miscellaneous Filing Re:

Proof of Service by Mail

05/20/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Related Case(s)

05/20/2022: Related Case(s)

Proof of Service by Mail

05/20/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

05/20/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Removal of Case to Federal Court

05/27/2022: Notice of Removal of Case to Federal Court

Notice of/to:

05/27/2022: Notice of/to:

CMC Notice - Fast Track

02/21/2023: CMC Notice - Fast Track

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBankruptcy Review Hearing; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Judicial Officer: Weil, Edward G; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket*Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Weil, Edward G; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of/to:; Comment: Removal of civil action to US District Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Case to Federal Court; Comment: CASE: 3:22-CV-03097

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Comment: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ON 5-20-22 SEE SVC LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Comment: ANS TO COMPLT ON 5-20-22 SEE SVC LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelated Case(s); Comment: C22-00368 FILED BY PG&E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Comment: NOTIFICATION OF EFFECTIVE DATE OF CHAPTER 11 PLAN & IMPOSITION OF INJUNCTION ON PRE PTN CLAIMS ON 5-20-22 SEE SVC LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing Re:; Comment: NOTIFICATION OF EFFECTIVE DATE OF CHAPTER 11 PLAN &IMPOSITION OF INJUNCTION ON PRE-PETITION CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFee Received for:; Comment: COMPLEX FEE FROM PG&E CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Unserved; Served: 04/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Comment: Personal service on 04/08/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docket*; Comment: Clerk`s Tickler to Check for Proof of Service was set for 5/27/22 at 7:00 in dept. 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketHearing set for:; Comment: Case Management Conference was set for 6/21/22 at 8:30 in Dept. 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Cause Of ActionComplaint; Type: Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Complaint; File Date: 02/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketOriginal Summons Issued/Filed; Comment: ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON Complaint/Petition FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFee Received for:; Comment: COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON Complaint/Petition PAID BY INFOTRACK US, INC *FEE: 220323-0291-CK CXP/ 500.00 CXP/ 500.00 Paymt *REFNM: 220323-0291-CK Reference Number 5013684

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Comment: CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint Filed - Summons Issued; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED *FEE: 220323-0288-CK ULC/ 435.00 Paymt *REFNM: 220323-0288-CK Reference Number 5013684

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less