This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:03:28 (UTC).

GIANT DEVELOPMENT VS. J.H. FITZMAURICE

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 GIANT DEVELOPMENT filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against J H FITZMAURICE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1059

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIANT DEVELOPMENT,L.P.

J.H. FITZMAURICE INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CELL-CRETE CORPORATION

GLASS AND SASH INC.

M PEREZ COMPANY INC.

TRI-STATE STAIRWAYCORP.

THE THOMPSON CONSTRUCTION GROUP,

DELTA BAY WATERPROOFING COMPANY,

J.H. FITZMAURICE, INC.,

SAN ANDREAS HVAC ARCHITECTURALSHEETMETAL

COUNTRY BUILDERS INC.,

P & M WINDOW CO., INC.,

DAWSON ELECTRIC

JOSEPH J. ALBANESE, INC.

HKIT ARCHITECTS

P&M WINDOW CO INC

VIC SOTTO LANDSCAPING, INC.

HARDISON KOMATSU IVELICH & TUCKER

Cross Defendants

MOES 1 - 100, INCLUSIVE

ROES 1 - 50

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STRAW, JAMES T.

1966 Tice Valley Boulevard #406

Walnut Creek, CA 94595

MURAL, GARRET D.

1111 Broadway, 24Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LE, KAYLA P

18100 Von Karman Ave Suite 750

Irvine, CA 92612

KIRWAN, SONDRA E.

950 E. Campbell Ave.

Campbell, CA 95008

RODMAN, JORDAN A

149 Stony Circle Suite 210

Santa Rosa, CA 95401

RAPP, SUSAN H.

P.O. Box 6107

Concord, CA 94524

UPPAL, SANDEEP K

1478 Stone Point Drive Suite 400

Roseville, CA 95661

LANDRY, KARIN L.

149 Stony Circle Suite 210

Santa Rosa, CA 95401

LINN, PETER J.

6001 Shellmound Street Suite 875

Emeryville, CA 94608

BLAKE, ALBERT P

P.O. Box 6107

Concord, CA 94520

FELDMAN, IAN R.

17901 Von Karman Suite 650

Irvine, CA 92614

LEVY, DAVID M

1600 South Main Plaza Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MURRAY, THOMAS J

1388 Sutter St Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94109

GUNN, BRIAN H

2175 N. California Blvd. Suite 645

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BUCCIERI, ROB

800 Airport Boulevard Suite 504

Burlingame, CA 94010

Other Attorneys

CZELUSNIAK, DAVID E.

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

SHAMBAUGH, CYNTHIA

525 Market Street Suite 2900

San Francisco, CA 94105

WELCH, STEPHEN B

333 Bush Street Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

SEROT, DANIEL A

1600 South Main Plaze, Ste 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

TANGONAN, KENYA T.

7964 Arjons Drive Suite I

San Diego, CA 92126

9 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 30 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 30 DAY(S); Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/21/2017 OF J.H. FITZMAURICE INC FILED BY CARONE & COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFS COMPLAINT FILED BY CARONE & COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR SEVER J.H. FITZMAURICE, INCS SPECIAL DEF OF STATU FILED BY J.H. FITZMAURICE, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • CHECK FOR SANCTION PAYMENT OF 250 FROM ATTY TYE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • JOINDER IN J.H. FITZMAURICE MOTION TO SEVER DEFS SPECIAL DEFENSE OF STATU OF LIMITATION FILED BY JOSEPH J. ALBANESE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
310 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 9/14/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 06/07/2017 OF GIANT DEVELOPMENT,L.P. RE: BUSINESS J.H. FITZMAURICE, INC., W/MAILING ON 07/26/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/07/2017 OF GIANT DEVELOPMENT,L.P. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/25/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/11/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Joseph J. Albanese, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID CZELUSNIAK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANGONAN KENYA T.