This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/19/2016 at 00:24:01 (UTC).

GHAZANFARI VS. FRANKLIN

Case Summary

On 09/20/2011 GHAZANFARI filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FRANKLIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0837

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAEZEH GHAZANFARI

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Defendant

KENNETH FRANKLIN

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2011
  • DocketCLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketMEMO TO SET COURT TRIAL FILED BY FAEZEH GHAZANFARI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/18/11 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY KENNETH FRANKLIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • DocketORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO KENNETH FRANKLIN IS GRANTED.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2011 OF FAEZEH GHAZANFARI FILED BY KENNETH FRANKLIN. ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2011 OF FAEZEH GHAZANFARI AS TO DEF ENDANT KENNETH FRANKLIN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/26/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketHEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 11/09/11 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2011 OF FAEZEH GHAZANFARI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less