Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 11:52:48 (UTC).

GDH ENTERPRISES VS MICHAEL ROBERTS CONST

Case Summary

On 01/26/2010 GDH ENTERPRISES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL ROBERTS CONST. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0233

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GDH ENTERPRISES

Defendants

WINDSOR WALNUT CREEK APARTMENTS LLC

MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEONIDOU & ROSIN

777 Cuesta Drive Suite 200

Mountain View, CA 94040

Defendant Attorney

ERVIN, COHEN & JESSUP

9401 Wilshire Blvd, 9Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 17 TO 09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • THIS CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH MASTER CASE C08-029958

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • ACTIONS CONSOLIDATED WITH MASTER CASE CIV/MSC08-02958

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • ALL FURTHER DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED IN MASTER CASE # MSC08-02958

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - CONSOLIDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • CASE DISPOSITIONED BY CONSOLIDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2010
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 01/26/2010 OF GDH ENTERPRISES RE: BUSINESS MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION INC W/MAILING ON 03/23/10 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 5/10/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/26/2010 OF GDH ENTERPRISES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/01/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/14/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GDH ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases where MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant