Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 10:48:05 (UTC).

GARNICK VS CORTEZ TRAVEL INC.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2012 GARNICK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CORTEZ TRAVEL INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0373

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEVEN H GARNICK

Danville, CA 94526

NANCY O GARNICK

Danville, CA 94526

Defendant

CORTEZ TRAVEL INC.,

1318 Santa Luisa Drive Aos: Monique Rodriguez

Solana Beach, CA 92075

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2013
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952-1952.3 AFTER PROPER NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 05/21/2012 OF STEVEN GARNICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 07/09/12 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 08/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS REFERAL TO MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 05/21/2012 OF STEVEN GARNICK AS TO CORTEZ TRAVEL INC., FILED. DATE OF MAILING 05/31/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 7/09/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $8,189.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less