Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 11:34:58 (UTC).

FUCHS VS DESOUSA

Case Summary

On 08/10/2012 FUCHS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DESOUSA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0598

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NANALEE FUCHS

Danville, CA 94506

MICHAEL FUCHS

Danville, CA 94506

Defendant

JOHN DESOUSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2012
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/10/2012 OF NANALEE FUCHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWL OF EXHIBITS FILED BY DEFT. - ID VERIFIED EXHIBITS RETURNED TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • EXHIBITS RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF, ID VERIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF EXHIBITS FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 11/01/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 11/01/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 10/11/12 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/15/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS REFERAL TO MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/10/2012 OF NANALEE FUCHS AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN DESOUSA FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 09/09/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/11/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less