This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 07:22:06 (UTC).

FREERICKS VS GLICKSTEIN

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 FREERICKS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GLICKSTEIN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0639

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARON FREERICKS

Fremont, CA 94538

Defendants

ALELI GLICKSTEIN

DAVID GLICKSTEIN

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COPY IN PICK UP UNDER F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • MONEY JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/15/2017 OF SHARON FREERICKS AGAINST DEFENDANT DAVID GLICKSTEIN, ALELI GLICKSTEIN, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 07/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/15/2017 OF SHARON FREERICKS FILED AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID GLICKSTEIN, ALELI GLICKSTEIN, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/15/2017 OF SHARON FREERICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • UNDER F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 7/31/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/15/2017 OF SHARON FREERICKS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.