Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 20:43:49 (UTC).

FOUNTILA VS. ROUND TABLE PIZZA INC.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2012 FOUNTILA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ROUND TABLE PIZZA INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2640

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAMAR FOUNTILA

Defendants

ROUND TABLE DEVELOPMENT CORP.

ROUND TABLE PIZZA,INC.

STEFANIA ANDERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHLIES, CHRISTPHER P

699 Peters Ave #B

Pleasanton, CA 94566

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2013
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 4/18/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY LAMAR FOUNTILA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/08/2012 OF LAMAR FOUNTILA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/28/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/14/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less