This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 13:25:44 (UTC).

FOSTER vs PROGRESSIVE INS/COST U LESS

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 FOSTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE INS/COST U LESS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0179

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORY FOSTER

Richmond, CA 94806

Defendants

COST U LESS INS.

El Cerrito, CA 94530

PROGRESSIVE INS.

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED ON BEHALF OF PROGRES SIVIE INSURANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: TO DEFT PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE NOTICE OF CORRECTED ORDER RTN TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTONE WITH CORRECTED DATE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF ORDER ON POSTPONEMENT AS TO PROGRESSIVE INS. UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY GREGORY FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 04/12/2016 OF GREGORY FOSTER AS TO PROGRESSIVE INS. FILED. DATE OF MAILING 08/16/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 04/12/2016 OF GREGORY FOSTER SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: COST U LESS INS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO GREGORY FOSTER IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 04/12/2016 OF GREGORY FOSTER SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: PROGRESSIVE INS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 5/16/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GREGORY FOSTER (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 5/16/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less