This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/19/2017 at 10:24:18 (UTC).

FOOD SPECIALISTS VS. FAGALDE

Case Summary

On 04/23/2015 FOOD SPECIALISTS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against FAGALDE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0198

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FOOD SPECIALISTS, INC.

3345-3351 LAKESHORE, LLC

BEECHER STREET PROPERTIES, LLC

SCOTT'S JACK LONDON SEAFOOD, INC.

1910 FAIRWAY DRIVE, LLC

RAYMOND J GALLAGHER

2500 EMBARCADERO, LLC

AURORA PARTNERS, LLC

SCOTT'S SEAFOOD GRILL & BAR(WALNUT CREEK),

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

STEPHEN FAGALDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BANIS, ALEXANDRA M

400 South El Camino Real Suite 1000

San Mateo, CA 94402-1704

VERNA, MICHAEL P

2121 N California Blvd Suite 875

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GUICHARD, MATTHEWM P

101 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 112

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: CMC ON RELATED CASE C15-00826 SET BY DEPT 17; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING WAS SET FOR 2/26/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR CONTINUANCE OF CMC FROM RAYMOND J GALLAGHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • NOTICE OF/TO CONTINUANCE OF CMC TO 3-18-16 FILED BY RAYMOND J GALLAGHER

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2015
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 02/04/2015 OF FOOD SPECIALISTS, INC. RE: BUSINESS STEPHEN FAGALDE W/MAILING ON 02/20/15 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 4/27/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/04/2015 OF FOOD SPECIALISTS, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/24/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/10/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUICHARD, MATTHEW P.