Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 07:11:36 (UTC).

FLORESE VS KEANE

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 FLORESE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KEANE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1251

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FILOMENA FLORESE

Defendants

CARROL V KEANE

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRBY, DONALD A.

2019 Clement Ave, Ste A

Alameda, CA 94501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2012
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF FILOMENA FLORESE FILED AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF FILOMENA FLORESE AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 09/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF FILOMENA FLORESE FILED AS TO DEFENDANT CARROL V KEANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF FILOMENA FLORESE AGAINST DEFENDANT CARROL V KEANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 08/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF FILOMENA FLORESE AS TO DEF ENDANT CARROL V KEANE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 10/09/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF FILOMENA FLORESE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less