This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 22:25:41 (UTC).

FLORES VS LIU

Case Summary

On 02/08/2011 FLORES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIU. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0217

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK FLORES

San Ramon, CA 94582

Defendant

ALICE LIU

San Ramon, CA 94582

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2013
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952-1952.3 AFTER PROPER NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 05/19/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 05/19/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 05/12/11 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/12/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • ADDITIONAL PROOF OF SERVICE PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/08/2011 OF MARK FLORES AS TO DEFENDANT ALICE LIU WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 03/28/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 5/12/11 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • COLOR OF FILE IS ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/08/2011 OF MARK FLORES SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: ALICE LIU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $7,500.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less