This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 23:28:24 (UTC).

FISHER VS VICE ULTRA LOUNGE;OKEARNEYS FUN HOUSE IN

Case Summary

On 01/30/2013 FISHER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VICE ULTRA LOUNGE OKEARNEYS FUN HOUSE IN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0771

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

LEROY FISHER

Bay Point, CA 94565

Defendants and Counter Claimants

VICE ULTRA LOUNGE

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

OKEARNEYS FUN HOUSE INC

1251 Arroyo Way Aos: Beverly Ann Epstein

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2013
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY EXHIBITS PURSUANT CCP1 952 SENT TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DESTROY EXHIBITS PURSUANT TO C P1952 SENT TO PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 06/19/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 06/19/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/26/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ROBERT S. KOSLOFF AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA AS TO WADE JOHNSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA AS TO MATT DELIMA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SMALL CLAIMS SUBPOENA AS TO JARRAD ANDREWS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2013
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY VICE ULTRA LOUNGE, OKEARNEYS FUN HOUSEINC (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $7,500.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD-CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/20/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less