Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 16:07:52 (UTC).

FIRESTONE VS. WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING

Case Summary

On 02/25/2013 FIRESTONE filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0420

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERIC FIRESTONE

SUZY FIRESTONE

PAUL HOWLEY

JOANN HOWLEY

MAINK SHARMA

JACQUELINE AQUINO

TIFFANY LICKTEIG

STEVE HERNANDEZ

ALMITA HERAMIA

EDDIE TUPAS

MARIA TUPAS

ERIN PAGUIA

Defendant

WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALANGA, GERALD B

3731 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 860

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

BRINK, TANNER D

1401 Willow Pass Road Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2014
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF COPY OF 4/23/14 MINUTE ORDER DISMISSING CASE SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR ATTY MALAN GAS FAILURE TO APPEAR 1/22/14 AND PROSECUTE CASE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: TANNER D BRINK, ESQ, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF PLTFS CASE DUE TO FTA ON 8-12/09-13 FOR FCMC & FAILURE TO SRV NTC OF CLAIM ON DEFT; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER FOR SANCTIONS SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • ORDER FOR SANCTIONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: ATTY MALANGAS FAILUER TO APPEAR 8/12/13 FOR FURTH ER CMC & FAILURE TO SRV NOTICE OF CLAIM ON DEFEND; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2013
  • MOTION TO/FOR STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLIANCE WITH FILED BY WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/25/2013 OF ERIC FIRESTONE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ONE LEGAL OBO LATTIE/MALANGA/LIBERTINO LLP, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: ERIC FIRESTONE, SUZY FIRESTONE, PAUL HOWLEY, JOANN HOWLEY, MAINK SHARMA, JACQUELINE AQUINO, TIFFANY LICKTEIG, STEVE HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/11/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 5/01/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRINK, TANNER D.