Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 11:43:50 (UTC).

FICKE VS SHEPARD

Case Summary

On 08/27/2012 FICKE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHEPARD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0625

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID BRUCE FICKE

Bow, WA 98232

Defendant

DIANE W. SHEPARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2013
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952-1952.3 AFTER PROPER NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/27/2012 OF DAVID FICKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • RE: WSC12-0625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • RETURNED MAIL: DEFTS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT NO SUCH NUMBER/UTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/06/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/06/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 10/29/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 10/29/12 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 08/27/2012 OF DAVID FICKE AS TO DIANE W. SHEPARD FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/10/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $62.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $5,935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less