This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 10:55:53 (UTC).

FHLM CORP VS BAKER

Case Summary

On 07/28/2009 FHLM CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BAKER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0723

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION,

Defendants

ALL OCCUPANTS

CHERYL L BAKER

DAVID W BAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMESON, GAYLE E

1770 Fourth Avenue

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA RETURNED U-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2009
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • DEFAULT PKT MAILED IN ENVELOPE PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • DECLARATION OF GAYLE E JAMESON & JESSICA L SCHROEDER FILED RE: DAILY RENTAL VALUE--$30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 08/31/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2009 OF FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, FILED AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID W BAKER, CHERYL L BAKER, ALL OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2009 OF FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, AGAINST DEFENDANT DAVID W BAKER, CHERYL L BAKER, ALL OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON 07/30/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2009 OF FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, AS TO DEF ENDANT CHERYL L BAKER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/29/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • ALL OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2009 OF FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, AS TO DEF ENDANT DAVID W BAKER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/29/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 9/23/09 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 07/28/2009 OF FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP - GAYLE E JAMESON ESQ