This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 04:28:25 (UTC).

FF HILLS VS DANIEL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2014 FF HILLS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DANIEL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0358

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FF HILLS LP

Defendants

THERESHA DANIEL

Richmond, CA 94806

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHALIDY, KAREEM M

7676 Hazard Center Dr. #900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketRETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 07/10/18 TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketSET JUDGMENT STATUS 0004 SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2014 OF FF HILLS LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN AMOUNT OF $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketMEMO OF COSTS ACCRUED MAILED ON 01/11/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,602.52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN AMOUNT OF $1.80

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF ACCRUED COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FILED. $0.00 CREDITS, $1,022.05 INTEREST AND $0.00 COSTS. MAILED ON 01/03/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,739.47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. KAJAL N ISLAM SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR FF HILLS LP AND IS REPLACED BY KAREEM M KHALIDY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 5/02/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO THERESHA DANIEL IS DENIED; Disposition: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2014 OF FF HILLS LP FILED BY THERESHA DANIEL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY THERESHA DANIEL (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 5/20/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2014 OF FF HILLS LP FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FF HILLS LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHALIDY KAREEM M.