This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 16:33:53 (UTC).

FF HILLS VS. AUGUSTINE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 FF HILLS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AUGUSTINE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0357

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FF HILLS LP

Defendants

REESHA REED

AJWANAE AUGUSTINE

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LI, LAURIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION & ORDER RETENTION OF PROPERTY AND PAYMENT OF BACK RENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO REESHA REED IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketCOPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketCOPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketMEMORANDUM TO SET FOR TRIAL FILED BY FF HILLS LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - U.D. WAS SET FOR 7/09/19 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2019 OF FF HILLS LP AGAINST DEFENDANT AJWANAE AUGUSTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2019 OF FF HILLS LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2019 OF FF HILLS LP FILED BY REESHA REED REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketPRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY REESHA REED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY REESHA REED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM TO RIGHT OF POSSESSSION SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 7/19/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2019 OF FF HILLS LP FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less