This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 02:47:18 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL V. KEY

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 FEDERAL NATIONAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KEY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0336

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

BRANDY N DAVIS-AMERSON

Antioch, CA 94509

JOHN KEY

ROBERT MURLEY

Antioch, CA 94509

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WECHSLER, GLENN H.

1111 Civic Drive Suite 210

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - CONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 05/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • UD TRIAL SET FOR 5/09/17 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • COURT REPORTER NOT REQUESTED BY FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ROBERT MURLEY IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM SENT TO GLENN H WECHSLER LAW OFFICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY BRANDY N DAVIS-AMERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM SENT TO GLENN H WECHSLER LAW OFFICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY ROBERT MURLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 5/15/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/30/2017 OF FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less