This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:04:49 (UTC).

ESTATE OF NORA HILL

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 ESTATE OF NORA HILL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0503

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Administrator and Petitioner

MARVELL D HILL

Decedent

NORA HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator and Petitioner Attorney

LIEBERMAN, GARY R

1615 Hill Road Suite 1

Novato, CA 94947

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • COPY(IES) AND CERTIFICATION(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • HEARING RE: PTN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED ON 01/29/16 BY MARVELL D HILL; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PET FOR FNL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCTN FILED (3/10/16 D14 @9AM) WITH PROOF OF MAILING TO: SEE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • HEARING WAS SET FOR 3/10/16 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR PETN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FROM MARVELL D HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • SUBSEQUENT PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING FILED BY MARVELL D HILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT - FINAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2015
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NTC OF PTN TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED; DATES OF PUBLICATION: 04/11/15. 04/13/15, 04/20/15, HRG 05/12/15 9AM D14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • WAIVER OF BOND AND NOMINATION OF ADM BY LORETTA NELSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • HEARING WAS SET FOR 5/12/15 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & ACKNOWLEGEMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED BY MARVELL D HILL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • REFEREE KFG IS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH NO WILL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less