This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/03/2017 at 13:08:08 (UTC).

ESTATE OF KATHLEEN YVONNE COOPER

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 ESTATE OF KATHLEEN YVONNE COOPER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1320

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Executor

MARGARET ALLSEBROOK

El Sobrante, CA 94820

Not Classified By Court

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Sacramento, CA 95899

Decedent

KATHLEEN YVONNE COOPER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED ON 06/28/17 BY MARGARET ALLSEBROOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WVR OF ACCT FILED (HEARING DATE 08/15/17 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 14) WITH P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • HEARING WAS SET FOR 8/15/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • (U.J.) NON-PARTY SUBSEQUENT PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED BY MARGARET ALLSEBROOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT - FINAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • PARTY REQUESTING SPECIAL NOTICE: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, IS REMOVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • (PROBATE) WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICEFILED BY DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • (PROBATE) DISMISSAL OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION ON SERVICE LIST FILED; SERVED ON 04/05/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2016
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED; DATES OF PUBLICATION: 090616. 090916, 0913, 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • HEARING WAS SET FOR 10/13/16 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & ACKNOWLEGEMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED BY MARGARET ALLSERBROOK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL EXECUTED ON 07/16/13 LODGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • REFEREE KFG IS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF ORIGINAL WILL FILED. LETTERS TESTAMENTARY REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.