This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 04:14:57 (UTC).

ERLINDA F. JIMENEZ VS SAMMUEL R. JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 04/10/2018 ERLINDA F JIMENEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SAMMUEL R JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1769

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ERLINDA F. JIMENEZ

Hercules, CA 94547

Respondent

SAMMUEL R. JIMENEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 04/10/2018 OF ERLINDA JIMENEZ AS TO SAMMUEL R. JIMENEZ (SERVED ON 04/14/18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/10/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/07/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 4/10/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/09/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 04/10/2018 OF ERLINDA JIMENEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ERLINDA F. JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/09/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.