This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/01/2017 at 11:30:23 (UTC).

ERENDIRA ALVAREZ VS. SALESI TUAI JR

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 ERENDIRA ALVAREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SALESI TUAI JR. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0524

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ERENDIRA ALVAREZ

Bay Point, CA 94565

Respondent

SALESI TUAI JR

Brentwood, CA 94513

Assignee

COUNTY OF CONTRA COSTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

50 Douglas Drive, Suite 100

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SALESI TUAI JR (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO SALESI TUAI JR IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSO/NULLITY/LEGAL SEP OF SALESI TUAI JR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN OF ERENDIRA ALVAREZ AS TO SALESI TUAI JR (SERVED ON 06/14/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • UPDATE 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN OF ERENDIRA ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN OF ERENDIRA ALVAREZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN OF ERENDIRA ALVAREZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 39 TO 27.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2014
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ERENDIRA ALVAREZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/28/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/28/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 1/28/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/14/2017 OF ERENDIRA ALVAREZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ERENDIRA ALVAREZ (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.